TN HB0895 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs TACIR to conduct a study comparing the length of sentences imposed on individuals currently incarcerated with current sentencing guidelines, and identify any disparities between sentences imposed for similar offenses; requires TACIR to submit a report to members of the general assembly by January 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to sentencing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/31/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
2021-02-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Finance, Ways, & Means Committee
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1488 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback