TN HB0895 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the minimum order requirements for new specialty earmarked license plates that allocate funds to nonprofit military or veteran service organizations from 1,000 to 500 plates for initial issuance and 800 to 400 plates for renewals. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the minimum order requirements for new specialty earmarked license plates that allocate funds to nonprofit military or veteran service organizations from 1,000 to 500 plates for initial issuance and 800 to 400 plates for renewals. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1284 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback