TN HB0895 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the amount a medical provider may charge an employee for medical reports, medical records, or documents relating to a workers' compensation claim from $10.00 for the first 20 pages to $10.00 for the first 30 pages. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the amount a medical provider may charge an employee for medical reports, medical records, or documents relating to a workers' compensation claim from $10.00 for the first 20 pages to $10.00 for the first 30 pages. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-19HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2015-02-18HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2015-02-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-11HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0506 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback