TN HB0895 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires funding of the BEP at the level of one ELL instructor for each 20 students who are English language learners and one ELL translator for each 200 students who are English language learners. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires funding of the BEP at the level of one ELL instructor for each 20 students who are English language learners and one ELL translator for each 200 students who are English language learners. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1118 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0895&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0895.pdf |