TN HB0895 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of education to post teacher effect data by LEA and school in which the teacher is employed on the Internet. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department of education to post teacher effect data by LEA and school in which the teacher is employed on the Internet. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-20 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
2011-04-13 Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/20/2011
2011-04-13 Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/20/2011
2011-04-06 Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/13/2011
2011-03-30 Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/13/2011
2011-03-23 Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/30/2011
2011-03-16 Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/30/2011
2011-03-09 Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/16/2011
2011-03-02 Action Def. in s/c Education Sub-committee to 3/16/2011
2011-02-23 Placed on s/c cal General Sub of Education for 3/2/2011
2011-02-22 Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education
2011-02-17 P2C, ref. to Education Committee
2011-02-16 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-15 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0788 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback