TN HB0895 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to TACIR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes minimum compensation and benefits for county and municipal veterans' service officers. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes minimum compensation and benefits for county and municipal veterans' service officers. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to TACIR
2010-03-03 Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/09/2010
2010-03-02 Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee
2010-02-24 Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 03/02/2010
2009-05-06 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
2009-04-29 Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009
2009-04-22 Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
2009-04-15 Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 04/22/2009
2009-02-18 Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to State & Local Government
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-11 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1336 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback