TN HB0893 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the value of real property assessed for property tax purposes be ascertained from evidence of its sound, intrinsic, and immediate value, for purposes of sale between a willing seller and buyer without consideration of speculative values, and when appropriate, subject to the Agricultural, Forest and Open Space Land Act of 1976; provides that evidence includes an independent appraisal commissioned by the owner of the residential property. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 39 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires that the value of real property assessed for property tax purposes be ascertained from evidence of its sound, intrinsic, and immediate value, for purposes of sale between a willing seller and buyer without consideration of speculative values, and when appropriate, subject to the Agricultural, Forest and Open Space Land Act of 1976; provides that evidence includes an independent appraisal commissioned by the owner of the residential property. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 39 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0753 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee