TN HB0893 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows manufacturers to obtain license to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, allows manufacturers to obtain license to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Sub-committee | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0629 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0893&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0893.pdf |