TN HB0890 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an LEA to remove a student from the regular school program without assigning the student to an alternative school or alternative program if the student was suspended or expelled for certain offenses that may threaten the safety of persons attending or assigned to the regular school program and the alternative school or alternative program is located on the same grounds as the regular school program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to alternative education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 4/22/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 229 | |
2021-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1223 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229