TN HB0890 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the board of claims to hear claims for compensation by persons whose convictions are vacated based on DNA evidence after serving at least 25 years in prison and to grant appropriate relief. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the board of claims to hear claims for compensation by persons whose convictions are vacated based on DNA evidence after serving at least 25 years in prison and to grant appropriate relief. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-04-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0750 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee