TN HB0888 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires students in public schools and public institutions of higher education to use restrooms and locker rooms that are assigned to persons of the same sex as that shown on the students' birth certificates. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires students in public schools and public institutions of higher education to use restrooms and locker rooms that are assigned to persons of the same sex as that shown on the students' birth certificates. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17HouseSponsor change.
2017-03-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-28HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-07HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
2017-03-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
2017-02-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-22HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2017-02-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0771 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-22 - Failed in Senate Education Committee (no motion)

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback