TN HB0888 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows the commissioner of the department to require certain reports from wardens regarding the staffing of penal institutions by law enforcement personnel, including, but not limited to, the work schedules of staff and the assigned workday rotation of staff. - Amends TCA Title 41 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows the commissioner of the department to require certain reports from wardens regarding the staffing of penal institutions by law enforcement personnel, including, but not limited to, the work schedules of staff and the assigned workday rotation of staff. - Amends TCA Title 41 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-01HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2015-03-25HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
2015-03-25HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-03-18HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
2015-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
2015-02-19HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2015-02-18HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2015-02-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-11HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0821 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback