TN HB0888 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, phases out the excise taxes imposed on tobacco products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, phases out the excise taxes imposed on tobacco products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2013-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Finance
2013-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-02-05HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0917 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback