TN HB0887 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes an insurer that offers a health benefit plan to deliver notices and documents related to health, vision, and dental coverage electronically to its insureds with consent. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56 and Title 71, relative to paperless electronic communications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 104
2023-03-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-06HouseComp. SB subst.
2023-03-02HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2023
2023-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2023
2023-02-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-02-22HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/28/2023
2023-02-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2023-02-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 2/21/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1297 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/23

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback