TN HB0887 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds the government operations committees of the house of representatives and the senate to the list of legislative committees the department must report to on the status of its state park management plan. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 11, relative to the department of environment and conservation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-04-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
2021-04-12HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-04-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2021
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseRef. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-02-22HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1075 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Signed by Senate Speaker

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback