TN HB0886 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows dealers, when reporting and remitting sales taxes to the department of revenue, to retain a certain portion of such taxes in order to compensate for costs incurred in accounting for and remitting such taxes; establishes certain maximum limitations for certain dealers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 5, relative to compensation for certain costs incurred by dealers in accounting for and remitting sales and use taxes to the state.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1140 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 1 (Amendment 1 - HA1068)