TN HB0886 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, clarifies that if, pursuant to current law, a local government appropriates nonrecurring funds for priority schools, evidenced by a written agreement with the LEA establishing the nonrecurring use of the funds, then such funds must be excluded from the maintenance of local funding requirement and from any apportionment requirement under the present law provisions governing the local tax levy for each year that the school is identified as a priority school plus one additional year. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, clarifies that if, pursuant to current law, a local government appropriates nonrecurring funds for priority schools, evidenced by a written agreement with the LEA establishing the nonrecurring use of the funds, then such funds must be excluded from the maintenance of local funding requirement and from any apportionment requirement under the present law provisions governing the local tax levy for each year that the school is identified as a priority school plus one additional year. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 439
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/22/2019
2019-05-22 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-15HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0376)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 1, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0326)
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-13HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseRef. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0976 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 439

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback