TN HB0886 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends group insurance to state employees who have been employed by the state for at least 60 days instead of 24 months and who will work 640 hours instead of 1,450 hours within a fiscal year whether compensated on hourly, daily, monthly, or piecework basis. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
As introduced, extends group insurance to state employees who have been employed by the state for at least 60 days instead of 24 months and who will work 640 hours instead of 1,450 hours within a fiscal year whether compensated on hourly, daily, monthly, or piecework basis. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Finance |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0953 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0886&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0886.pdf |