TN HB0885 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Prior Authorization Fairness Act." - Amends TCA Title 53; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 53; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to healthcare services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-19 Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 01/01/2025
2023-05-19 Pub. Ch. 395
2023-05-11 Signed by Governor.
2023-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-28HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-24HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-04-18SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2023-04-18SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0293)
2023-04-18SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2023-04-12SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-04-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-04-10HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2023-04-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-10HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0265)
2023-04-06HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2023
2023-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023
2023-04-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/3/2023
2023-03-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-06HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2023-03-06HouseRef. to Insurance Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0666 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 395

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback