TN HB0885 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 568
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 568
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the executive director of the commission to convene a study group to meet to study the concept of a promise zone and the feasibility of a pilot project for promise zones in Memphis and Knoxville. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, requires the executive director of the commission to convene a study group to meet to study the concept of a promise zone and the feasibility of a pilot project for promise zones in Memphis and Knoxville. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Pub. Ch. 568 | |
2009-07-07 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-07-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-19 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-18 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-16 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-16 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-12 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-11 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-11 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-11 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0542) | |
2009-06-11 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0778) | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 6/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-06-10 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on s/c cal Study Committee Sub-committee of Budget for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action Def. in s/c Study Committee Sub-committee of Budget to next calendar | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on s/c cal Study Committee Sub-committee of Budget for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to Study Subcommittee | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to last calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1561 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 568