TN HB0884 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018
Pending: House Civil Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits a valid handgun carry permit holder to carry a firearm at any time and in all places in Tennessee unless the permit holder has been drinking alcohol, is in a judicial proceeding, or is on school grounds and does not tell the principal. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351(b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits a valid handgun carry permit holder to carry a firearm at any time and in all places in Tennessee unless the permit holder has been drinking alcohol, is in a judicial proceeding, or is on school grounds and does not tell the principal. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351(b).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-08HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/2017
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
2017-02-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/8/2017
2017-02-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/22/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1341 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback