TN HB0880 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 284
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 284
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires persons convicted of the offense of sexual contact with inmates to register as a sexual offender and allows such persons to file a request for termination of registration no sooner than three years after termination of active supervision or no sooner than three years after discharge from incarceration without supervision. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.
Title
As enacted, requires persons convicted of the offense of sexual contact with inmates to register as a sexual offender and allows such persons to file a request for termination of registration no sooner than three years after termination of active supervision or no sooner than three years after discharge from incarceration without supervision. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 284 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 1 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0853 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 284