TN HB0876 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, places all responsibility for building standards and fire safety inspections on business occupancies and places of assembly in buildings less than three stories in height with certain local jurisdictions that have been approved by the state fire marshal to enforce codes inspections. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, places all responsibility for building standards and fire safety inspections on business occupancies and places of assembly in buildings less than three stories in height with certain local jurisdictions that have been approved by the state fire marshal to enforce codes inspections. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1136 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0876&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0876.pdf |