TN HB0874 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the tax credit allowed for the purchase of brownfield property to include real property that was previously the subject of an investigation or remediation as a brownfield project under a voluntary agreement or consent order; revises other provisions related to the tax credit. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
As introduced, expands the tax credit allowed for the purchase of brownfield property to include real property that was previously the subject of an investigation or remediation as a brownfield project under a voluntary agreement or consent order; revises other provisions related to the tax credit. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1235 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee