TN HB0873 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that whenever Coffee County acquires property at a tax sale, any non-governmental entity holding a vested and duly recorded contractual right to the payment of fees or assessments secured by such property retains such right; further provides that Coffee County will be liable for the payment of such fees and assessments if the county makes actual use of the property purchased at the tax sale. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 67, Chapter 5, relative to property bought by a county at a tax sale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0191 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022