TN HB0873 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows petitions for post-conviction relief based on new non-scientific evidence establishing that the petitioner is actually innocent of the offense for which the petitioner was convicted; establishes certain requirements for evidence on which such petitions are based. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 30, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, allows petitions for post-conviction relief based on new non-scientific evidence establishing that the petitioner is actually innocent of the offense for which the petitioner was convicted; establishes certain requirements for evidence on which such petitions are based. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 30, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Jason Potts [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0405 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee