TN HB0867 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of children's services to provide a report to the district attorney general with jurisdiction following a fatality or near fatality of certain children; requires an immediate investigation into a report of child abuse from a party tasked with the education or health and welfare of the child. - Amends TCA Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner of children's services to provide a report to the district attorney general with jurisdiction following a fatality or near fatality of certain children; requires an immediate investigation into a report of child abuse from a party tasked with the education or health and welfare of the child. - Amends TCA Title 37.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-26HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1403 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback