TN HB0866 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a delivery service licensee to charge a fee based on a percentage of the sales of the alcoholic beverages or beer being delivered; limits the fee to no more than 10 percent of the price of each alcoholic beverage or beer sold. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 185 | |
2021-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 3, PNV 2 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0103) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 10, PNV 8 |
2021-03-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0080) |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0269 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 185