TN HB0865 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the board to determine the percentage of any increase in funds appropriated to the instructional salaries and wages component of the basic education program (BEP) and increase the minimum salary on the state salary schedule by that percentage. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to instructional salaries and wages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1338 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021