TN HB0863 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts certain students from payment of out-of-state tuition at state institutions of higher education. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 58; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, exempts certain students from payment of out-of-state tuition at state institutions of higher education. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 58; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] |
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Steve McDaniel [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Failed in Education Administration & Planning (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Failed in Education Administration & Planning |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1014 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-22 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0