TN HB0862 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from March 1 to February 15 of each year the date by which the department of safety shall report to the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives and the chairs of the appropriate committees a report detailing seizures for the previous calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.
Title
As introduced, changes from March 1 to February 15 of each year the date by which the department of safety shall report to the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives and the chairs of the appropriate committees a report detailing seizures for the previous calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2019-04-02 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1289 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee