TN HB0860 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a person convicted of voter fraud in any state from assisting a person with voting in this state, including early voting and by absentee ballot. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a person convicted of voter fraud in any state from assisting a person with voting in this state, including early voting and by absentee ballot. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 271 | |
2019-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1264 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 271