TN HB0860 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an exception to the offense of simple possession of marijuana for persons with a valid, state-issued medical marijuana identification card who obtained the marijuana pursuant to a valid physician's recommendation. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, creates an exception to the offense of simple possession of marijuana for persons with a valid, state-issued medical marijuana identification card who obtained the marijuana pursuant to a valid physician's recommendation. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/30/2018 |
2017-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0673 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee