TN HB0857 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 818
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 818
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes Davidson County to impose and collect a solid waste collection, processing, and disposal fee; adds solid waste "processing" as an authorized expenditure for the surcharge on each ton of municipal solid waste received at a solid waste disposal facility or incinerator. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Title
As enacted, authorizes Davidson County to impose and collect a solid waste collection, processing, and disposal fee; adds solid waste "processing" as an authorized expenditure for the surcharge on each ton of municipal solid waste received at a solid waste disposal facility or incinerator. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 818 | |
2016-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-06 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/9/2016 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1049 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 818