TN HB0856 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "hotel" for purposes of the hotel occupancy tax to mean any structure or space, or any portion thereof, that is occupied or intended or designed for occupancy by transients for dwelling, lodging, or sleeping purposes, and includes privately, publicly, or government-owned hotels, inns, tourist camps, tourist courts, tourist cabins, motels, short-term rental units, primitive and recreational vehicle campsites and campgrounds, or any place in which rooms, lodgings, or accommodations are furnished to transients for consideration. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4; Title 13, Chapter 7; Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 4; Title 13, Chapter 7; Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 4, relative to the collection of privilege taxes on occupancy.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 334 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0288) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 60, Nays 16, PNV 12 |
2021-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0245) |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0576 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 334