TN HB0854 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes law enforcement to scan driver's portable electronic device if officer has probable cause to believe driver was using device in violation of state law and driver was involved in an accident resulting in death or serious bodily injury; revises the description of the devices to which the prohibition on texting and driving apply. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, authorizes law enforcement to scan driver's portable electronic device if officer has probable cause to believe driver was using device in violation of state law and driver was involved in an accident resulting in death or serious bodily injury; revises the description of the devices to which the prohibition on texting and driving apply. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2018-01-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 1/10/2018 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2018 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Criminal Justice |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0324 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-08 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee