TN HB0850 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the public utility commission to post on its website in a manner accessible to the general public an electronic copy of the most recent annual report to the general assembly and governor on all matters relating to the commission for the preceding year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 9; Title 12; Title 13; Title 35, Chapter 8, Part 1; Section 37-10-204; Section 38-6-121; Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 54; Title 55; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 9; Title 12; Title 13; Title 35, Chapter 8, Part 1; Section 37-10-204; Section 38-6-121; Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 54; Title 55; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to telecommunications.
Sponsors
Rep. Tandy Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1566 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee