TN HB0850 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, designates any facility on the campus of a public institution of higher education that is designed and used for school-sanctioned sporting events as a sports authority facility for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, designates any facility on the campus of a public institution of higher education that is designed and used for school-sanctioned sporting events as a sports authority facility for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 99
2019-03-21HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0598 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 99

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback