TN HB0843 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Reset on next avail. cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes concerning the prescription of certain Scheduled controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes concerning the prescription of certain Scheduled controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-03-07HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019
2019-03-05HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0810 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-22 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback