TN HB0835 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the judicial performance evaluation commission, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, extends the judicial performance evaluation commission, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Bell (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Bell (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | Senate | Held on desk. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 26, Nays 5 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | S. adopted am. 2 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2013-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0567 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-19 - Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0451)