TN HB0833 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2024
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires an affidavit of affixation for a manufactured home affixed to a parcel of real property to contain a statement that the manufactured home is permanently connected to a functioning septic system, not just a septic system. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47; Title 55; Title 66; Title 68 and Title 69, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 47; Title 55; Title 66; Title 68 and Title 69, Chapter 3, relative to septic systems.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2024
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
2023-03-08HouseRef. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
2023-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0642 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback