TN HB0833 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Primacy and Reclamation Act of Tennessee." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10; Title 50; Title 59; Title 60; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Primacy and Reclamation Act of Tennessee." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10; Title 50; Title 59; Title 60; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Bill Sanderson [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2016 |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0842 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0833&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0833.pdf |