TN HB0824 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a licensee that offers interactive sports wagering from allowing a person to place a bet or wager at the same location as where the person entered into a flex loan plan, a title pledge agreement, a deferred presentment services agreement, or a check cashing transaction; prohibits certain provisions in documents for such transactions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51; Title 39; Title 45; Title 47 and Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 51; Title 39; Title 45; Title 47 and Title 48, relative to financial institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2021-04-06 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1029 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee