TN HB0822 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee state veterans' homes board to name, subject to the governor's approval, the campus, buildings, facilities, and grounds of any state veterans' home; authorizes the administrator of each veterans' home to name any portion of the state veterans' home. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee state veterans' homes board to name, subject to the governor's approval, the campus, buildings, facilities, and grounds of any state veterans' home; authorizes the administrator of each veterans' home to name any portion of the state veterans' home. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0678 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee