TN HB0822 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires juveniles to undergo a mental health screening after being found delinquent twice of an offense that would be considered a misdemeanor if committed by an adult. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires juveniles to undergo a mental health screening after being found delinquent twice of an offense that would be considered a misdemeanor if committed by an adult. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04HouseFailed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-21HouseReset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2017
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0920 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback