TN HB0822 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 455
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that in Shelby County a lease of property owned by an airport authority that exceeds 30 years is not subject to local approval; specifies that a lessee under a lease negotiated with an airport authority will not be subject to having the property assessed as if the lessee were the owner; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-203.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that in Shelby County a lease of property owned by an airport authority that exceeds 30 years is not subject to local approval; specifies that a lessee under a lease negotiated with an airport authority will not be subject to having the property assessed as if the lessee were the owner; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-203.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-26 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 455
2015-04-22HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-04-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015
2015-04-21HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2015-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
2015-04-16HouseReset on cal. for 4/20/2015
2015-04-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
2015-04-14HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2015-04-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015
2015-04-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
2015-04-07HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/7/2015
2015-04-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-25HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
2015-03-24HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-03-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/24/2015
2015-03-18HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
2015-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
2015-02-19HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2015-02-18HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2015-02-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-11HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0741 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 455

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback