TN HB0822 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, updates references to 2010 TIGER system and geography; clarifies provisions concerning districts, terms and vacancies prior to November 2012 elections; clarifies that contiguity by water is sufficient. - Amends TCA Section 3-1-102.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, updates references to 2010 TIGER system and geography; clarifies provisions concerning districts, terms and vacancies prior to November 2012 elections; clarifies that contiguity by water is sufficient. - Amends TCA Section 3-1-102.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-23 Withdrawn.
2011-02-22 Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
2011-02-17 P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee
2011-02-16 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-14 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0889 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-19 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback