TN HB0819 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 859
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 859
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the retail sale of wine and alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 859 | |
2022-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0384 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2023