TN HB0818 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the business tax exemption under present law for providing mental or behavioral health services to providers of foster care, therapeutic and rehabilitative care, residential treatment, and other social assistance programs. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, extends the business tax exemption under present law for providing mental or behavioral health services to providers of foster care, therapeutic and rehabilitative care, residential treatment, and other social assistance programs. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1213 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee