TN HB0811 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases maximum amount of additional fee that may be imposed on certain sales in central improvement districts under the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act; specifies how additional fee may be used. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, relative to tourism development.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 466 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0424 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021